SUPPORTING AFRICAN YOUTH DEVELOPMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support children and youth to live a better life, We organise day trips for youth and parents. We organise supplementary school classes. we organise recreational activities for the youth which include, music classes and activities, outdoor and indoor games.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
- Throughout London
- Uganda
Governance
- 29 January 2000: Standard registration
- SAYD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FREDDY LATIGO-NONO | Chair | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
CLAIR CAMPBELL | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
AIDAH AGABA | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JIMMY JEMBA LUTAAYA | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JULIET NAKIBONEKA | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.71k | £13.80k | £13.43k | £15.05k | £10.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.74k | £12.08k | £11.96k | £14.95k | £10.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.00k | £7.53k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 April 2022 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13-6-99, AMENDED 23-1-00
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FOR PERSONS LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SPORTS ACTIVITIES, MUSIC CLASSES AND ACTIVITIES, EDUCATIONAL EXCURSIONS AND SOCIAL EVENTS FOR PERSONS IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH. 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES, BY PROVIDING TUITION AND SUPPORT TO ASSIST CHILDREN IN THEIR SCHOOLWORK.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
116 Tolworth Rise South
SURBITON
Surrey
KT5 9NJ
- Phone:
- 02083306795
- Email:
- sayd1999@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window