PRIORY SPECIAL NEEDS PARENTS SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing restbite care for families and supervised play activities for physically disabled children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 29 October 1999: Standard registration
- 17 May 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DYNAMITE (Working name)
- DYNAMITE KIDS (Working name)
- PRIORY SPECIALS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.01k | £5.50k | £50 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.17k | £10.86k | £1.69k | £226 | £226 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
THE CARE, WELFARE, TREATMENT, EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT OF PERSONS WITH ANY FORM OF CEREBRAL PALSY OR WITH A RELATED DISABILITY, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE "CLIENTS").
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE SLOUGH, WINDSOR, MAIDENHEAD AND SOUTH BUCKINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window