PLAY THERAPY SERVICES NORTHAMPTONSHIRE (PTSN)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Playtime is provides play therapy, which allows children who have experienced trauma the opportunity to explore their emotions through play.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 09 January 2001: Standard registration
- 31 August 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PLAY THERAPY SERVICES NORTHAMPTONSHIRE (Working name)
- PLAYTIME (Working name)
- PTSN (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.68k | £223.35k | £173.28k | £208.44k | £36.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £181.54k | £222.18k | £166.95k | £194.21k | £59.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH OCTOBER 2000 AS AMENDED 15 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF EMOTIONAL SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST CHILDREN IN NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF A PLAY THERAPY SERVICE AND THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN THERAPEUTIC PLAY
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window