Financial history CUDWORTH COMMUNITY ENTERPRISES

Charity number: 1080355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £323.57k £316.74k £293.25k £344.47k £411.28k
Total expenditure £305.56k £301.38k £319.89k £351.57k £399.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £21.96k
Income from government grants £212.20k £209.71k N/A N/A £254.95k