WOULDCARE THE WOODA PATIENT PARTICIPATION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE TRANSPORT FOR ANY PATIENT TO AND FROM THE SURGERY AND LOCAL HOSPITALS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 06 December 1999: Standard registration
- WOULDCARE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NOEL STUART BEVAN | Trustee | 03 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JESSICA ELISABETH THEODORA DANIELSON | Trustee | 30 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY MOORE | Trustee | 30 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Lisa Walter Mrs | Trustee | 30 May 2017 |
|
|||||
MECHELLE DAWN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 30 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUSTINE ANN DUHIG | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|||||
GILLIAN BEVAN | Trustee | 13 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA JOAN HUMPHREYS | Trustee | 03 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JOHN HUMPHREYS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.41k | £15.47k | £4.10k | £24.66k | £2.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.91k | £9.89k | £4.28k | £10.00k | £8.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED 27 OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS OF THE WOODA SURGERY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, INFIRM OR ELDERLY BY THE PROVISION OF TRANSPORT EQUIPMENT AND OTHER AMENITIES AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID SURGERY.
Area of benefit
PATIENTS OF THE WOODA SURGERY
Contact information
- Address:
-
FORGE COTTAGE
PUMP LANE
ABBOTSHAM
BIDEFORD
EX39 5AZ
- Phone:
- 01237422079
- Email:
- albrenda.humphreys@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window