Financial history DOXEY PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1077136
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014
Total gross income £56.50k £46.20k £49.12k £46.42k £6.60k
Total expenditure £49.06k £67.65k £51.32k £50.03k £13.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A