DOXEY PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide safe happy environment for 2 to 4 year old children. To educate and maintain security for them as most come from a deprived area of Stafford where lots of parents struggle financially due to low income. To provide afterschool, before school and wrap around services to enable more parents back to work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 24 August 1999: Standard registration
- 17 May 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DOXEY PRE-SCHOOL COMMUNITY SERVICES (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.50k | £46.20k | £49.12k | £46.42k | £6.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.06k | £67.65k | £51.32k | £50.03k | £13.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JULY 1999 AS AMENDED ON 5 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE
Area of benefit
DOXEY STAFFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window