Governing document CHILDHOOD CANCER PARENTS ALLIANCE
Charity Number: 1090871

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED ON 29 JANUARY 2000, 7 APRIL 2000, 1 MAY 2000 AND 10 NOVEMBER 2001. AS AMENDED ON 13 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION TO THE PUBLIC BY; A) THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION ADVICE AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES; B) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO CHILDHOOD CANCER AT NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL LEVEL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.