Accounts and annual returns THE ART STUDIO (SUNDERLAND)

Charity Number: 1078126
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 25 February 2010 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 24 February 2010 24 days late
Annual return 31 March 2008 18 June 2009 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 18 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 20 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 30 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 30 November 2006 On Time