Financial history THE ART STUDIO (SUNDERLAND)

Charity Number: 1078126
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £99.43k £79.63k £97.66k £90.93k £126.90k
Total expenditure £122.57k £107.31k £100.60k £76.76k £86.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A