THE RAINBOW PROGRAMME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Rainbow programme is a centre of excellence for healing abuse. The Rainbow programme supports people who have been through abuse, by subsidising their therapy & groupwork.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Blaenau Gwent
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Vale Of Glamorgan
- Wiltshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 27 January 2000: Standard registration
- 13 April 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 13 April 2023: Funds transferred to 1099140 KINERGY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £341 | £336 | £336 | £338 | £240 | |
|
Total expenditure | £555 | £880 | £363 | £200 | £5.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 22 April 2021 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE ON 28 JULY 1999 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT MADE ON 21 DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR WOMEN AND CHILDREN, WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN SUFFERING FROM VIOLENCE OR PHYSICAL OR SEXUAL ABUSE BY THE PROVISION OF COMPLIMENTARY MEDICAL TREATMENTS, PRACTICAL ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND COUNSELLING 2) THE RELIEF OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED, BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OR OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OR THE PROVISION OF SHELTERED ACCOMMODATION 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO VIOLENCE AND PHYSICAL OR SEXUAL ABUSE
Area of benefit
BRISTOL AND 40 MILES RADIUS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window