THE NEUROFIBROMATOSIS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's mission is to enable people concerned about neurofibromatosis to find solutions appropriate for them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 January 2000: Standard registration
- Nerve Tumours UK (Working name)
- NFA (Previous name)
- THE NEURO FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Eric Greenway Goode | Chair | 28 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Matthew William Buchan Jones | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Meena Upadhyaya | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|||||||
Jonathan Peter Bruce | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|||||||
Alexis Rohan Chanmugam | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Rosalie Elaine Ferner | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Ezran Fry | Trustee | 07 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £467.36k | £325.24k | £397.17k | £512.52k | £456.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £423.53k | £330.72k | £390.59k | £448.33k | £424.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £60.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £424.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £87.35k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £668 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £145.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £342.20k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £106.13k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.02k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM NEUROFIBROMATOSIS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
44 Coombe Lane
London
SW20 0LA
- Phone:
- 02084391234
- Email:
- info@nervetumours.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window