Accounts and annual returns THE MARY GORDON TRUST

Charity number: 1086671
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 05 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 17 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required