Financial history THE MARY GORDON TRUST

Charity number: 1086671
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £0 £0 £110 £760 £110
Total expenditure £350 £0 £0 £1.12k £15
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A