Financial history ECTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1078962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £24.58k £13.72k £22.90k £30.05k £36.59k
Total expenditure £14.69k £21.81k £18.88k £36.65k £33.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £3.91k N/A