Trustees ECTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1078962

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Brock | Chair | 13 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Marr ODonnell | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alistair James McCarter | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Jane Fernley | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Christopher Hulse | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary Bond | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Hunt | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE REID | Trustee | 15 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE NELSON | Trustee | 06 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
SALLY Jones | Trustee | 20 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
COLIN SOTHEBY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.