JADE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty, community and economic development and promotion of Christian religion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 February 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR BARNEY SKRENTNY | Chair |
|
||||||
ROBERT ASHWORTH | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANNE BELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD JOHN BELL R J | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHANTHA APPAVOO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.90k | £54.88k | £53.27k | £39.59k | £108.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.45k | £48.40k | £54.65k | £32.26k | £99.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 June 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 12 June 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 10 July 2023 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 10 July 2023 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 June 2022 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 June 2022 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 July 2021 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 19 July 2021 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH JULY 1999 AND AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 9TH NOVEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT C) TO PROMOTE ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT FOR THE WIDER PUBLIC BENEFIT IN AREAS AND AMONGST PEOPLE GROUPS SUFFERING MATERIAL AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT D) TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONGST THOSE PERSONS SEEKING EMPLOYMENT BUT WHO ARE UNABLE TO OBTAIN WORK BY REASON OF (1) THEIR LACK OF OPPORTUNITIES OR (11) THEIR YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY POVERTY OR THEIR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT E) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUST MAY BE OPERATING AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK IFI
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
43-45 Camden Road
LONDON
NW1 9LR
- Phone:
- 02074852465
- Email:
- jade1@turn.uk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window