Financial history N.E.A.A.( NORFOLK ELDERS ADVOCACY ALLIANCE) ("THE ALLIANCE")

Charity Number: 1078600
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £75.94k £108.76k £43.45k £204 £0
Total expenditure £80.41k £83.26k £76.39k £5.19k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A