THE PRIORY OF ENGLAND AND THE ISLANDS OF THE MOST VENERABLE ORDER OF THE HOSPITAL OF ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM

Charity number: 1077265
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide First Aid Training, First Aid Services, Ambulance Services, Youth Services

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 October 1999: Standard registration
  • 10 July 2019: Funds received from
  • 22 December 2020: Funds received from
  • 17 June 2024: Funds received from
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST JOHN AMBULANCE (Working name)
  • THE PRIORY OF ENGLAND AND THE ISLANDS (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carole Ann Lawrence-Parr Trustee 03 July 2024
None on record
Rear Admiral Simon Paul Williams CB CVO Trustee 24 June 2023
None on record
Revd Canon Dr Paul Rhys Williams Trustee 09 March 2023
THE CENTRE FOR MARIAN STUDIES
Received: On time
SANDRINGHAM ESTATE COTTAGE HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY TRUST
Received: On time
THE HOSPITAL OF THE HOLY AND UNDIVIDED TRINITY AT CASTLE RISING
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SANDRINGHAM WITH WEST NEWTON AND APPLETON
Recently registered
CALLIBUT'S CHARITY (HILLINGTON SHARE)
Received: On time
Tanya Coff Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Dr Rosalind Anita Jane Smith Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Ashley Sweetland MBE CStJ Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £102.40m £92.30m £114.10m £120.10m £107.90m
Total expenditure £108.10m £99.20m £106.60m £120.40m £124.10m
Income from government contracts £251.00k £322.40k £893.00k £2.41m £20.46m
Income from government grants £594.00k £11.84m £568.00k £43.05k £340.39k
Income - Donations and legacies £16.90m £25.80m £15.30m £17.20m £14.80m
Income - Other trading activities £1.30m £600.00k £700.00k £700.00k £800.00k
Income - Charitable activities £81.10m £63.50m £94.50m £96.90m £88.00m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.30m £1.10m £900.00k £900.00k £900.00k
Income - Other £1.80m £1.30m £2.70m £4.40m £3.40m
Income - Legacies £3.40m £3.90m £2.50m £5.10m £3.60m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £99.00m £90.10m £97.70m £110.40m £114.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.10m £9.10m £8.90m £10.00m £10.10m
Expenditure - Governance £1.20m £1.20m £1.40m £1.40m £1.50m
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £100.00k £200.00k £100.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £71.30m £71.60m £72.00m £75.90m £79.10m
Long-term investments £36.20m £27.00m £30.10m £27.30m £20.30m
Other assets £34.10m £37.90m £46.00m £38.50m £19.60m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £20.90m £24.20m £28.30m £25.60m £19.50m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 13 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/10/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/12/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/03/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/09/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/05/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/12/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Registration history
  • 29 October 1999 : Standard registration
  • 10 July 2019 : Asset transfer in
  • 22 December 2020 : Asset transfer in
  • 17 June 2024 : Asset transfer in

Contact information

Address:
St John's Gate
St John's Lane
Clerkenwell
London
EC1M 4DA
Phone:
0370 0104 950