PORTSMOUTH ABUSE AND RAPE COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Face to face therapy: Ports. P01-P06 13 yrs+. Ports. and South East Hampshire 13 yrs+. Schools: Outreach schools programme P01-P06. Phone Support: Telephone helplines Mon 1pm - 3pm; Wed. 7pm-10pm, Fri 7pm-10pm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 22 March 2000: Standard registration
- PARCS (Working name)
- PORTSMOUTH AREA RAPE CRISIS SERVICE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Raymond Hargrave | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Family Action | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
David Charles Holmes | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
DAVID CHARLES HOLMES | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £475.39k | £528.47k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £472.19k | £555.77k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £225.76k | £507.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £84.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £13.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £6.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £507.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £81 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £536.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £19.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/10/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/08/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 FEB 2018 as amended on 22 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
4. The Charity’s objects (“the Objects”) are, in relation to rape, sexual abuse, sexual exploitation or interpersonal abuse or violence:- 4.1 to relieve the suffering, illness and distress of survivors whenever occurring; 4.2 to promote the education and research into the effect on survivors and significant others whether physical, medical, psychological or social.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE CITY OF PORTSMOUTH AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Family Action
34 Wharf Road
LONDON
N1 7GR
- Phone:
- 02392669514
- Email:
- admin@parcs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window