CROSS STREET CHAPEL MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of religious and spiritual activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
Governance
- 22 May 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aaron Breeze | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Coyne | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alvin Summerscales | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Calvert | Trustee | 10 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.84k | £99.16k | £104.83k | £134.73k | £141.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.33k | £103.84k | £104.38k | £122.70k | £149.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.76k | £5.24k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/03/2000
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF PURE RELIGION IN THE WORSHIP OF GOD AND THE SERVICE OF HUMAN KIND IN THE SPIRIT OF JESUS CHRIST. NO DOCTRINAL TEST SHALL BE IMPOSED UPON ITS MINISTER(S), ITS MEMBERS OR OTHERS WHO ATTEND ITS SERVICES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cross Street Chapel
29 Cross Street
MANCHESTER
M2 1NL
- Phone:
- 0161 833 0522
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window