INDEPENDENT DOMESTIC ABUSE SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides refuge accommodation, advice, advocacy, and practical support for women and their children experiencing domestic abuse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£6,743,060
Donations and legacies | £104.24k | |
Charitable activities | £6.57m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £64.04k |
Total expenditure:
£6,627,038
Raising funds | £5.10k | |
Charitable activities | £6.62m | |
Other | £0 |
£91,119 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,458,334 from 12 government contract(s) and £1,233,787 from 12 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.62m | |
Retained for future use | £116.02k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.62m | |
Retained for future use | £207.14k |
People

160 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
61 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 25 February 2004: Standard registration
- 07 May 2024: Funds received from 1169476 PRESENCE CHURCH (HARROGATE) UK
- YORK WOMEN'S AID (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Mulligan | Chair | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alana Jessie Shephard Wilde | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Kathryn Umpleby | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Jane Acklam | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Raine | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Vanita Sundaram | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Seabrooke | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Walker | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Collins | Trustee | 15 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.09m | £4.87m | £4.87m | £5.84m | £6.74m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.83m | £4.38m | £4.92m | £5.76m | £6.63m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £3.38m | £3.30m | £3.53m | £3.96m | £4.46m | |
|
Income from government grants | £74.75k | £947.65k | £732.64k | £974.69k | £1.23m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £215.22k | £182.31k | £120.64k | £103.69k | £104.24k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.85m | £4.68m | £4.73m | £5.68m | £6.57m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £19.20k | £10.01k | £18.33k | £57.26k | £64.04k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.81m | £4.36m | £4.91m | £5.76m | £6.62m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £22.20k | £25.49k | £10.90k | £1.01k | £5.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £30.54k | £44.49k | £47.60k | £47.60k | £80.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £56.57k | £108.25k | £122.54k | £95.43k | £76.50k | |
|
Long-term investments | £537.14k | £708.72k | £735.54k | £686.86k | £777.68k | |
|
Other assets | £855.19k | £1.54m | £1.41m | £1.77m | £1.91m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £400.61k | £647.10k | £587.59k | £841.08k | £844.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 DECEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 13 SEPTEMBER 2007, 12 FEBRUARY 2009 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 AUG 2016 as amended on 06 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity are, for the public benefit, to: (a) relieve the needs of persons in Yorkshire and across the UK who have been subject to or affected (whether directly or indirectly) by, or who are at risk of, domestic abuse and/or sexual violence; and (b) reduce the occurrence of domestic abuse and sexual violence in the UK and beyond in particular, but not exclusively, by: (i) providing accommodation, support and advice; (ii) providing single sex services, including refuge accommodation and therapeutic groups for women; (iii) undertaking research and providing information, training and education about domestic abuse and sexual violence including its causes, consequences and prevention; and (iv) raising public awareness about domestic abuse and sexual violence and in this article, “domestic abuse” means physical, sexual, emotional, financial or coercive control within an intimate or family relationship.
Area of benefit
YORK
Contact information
- Address:
-
39
Blossom Street
York
YO24 1AQ
- Phone:
- 03000 110 110
- Email:
- boardsecretary@idas.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window