Accounts and annual returns THE S HODGKISS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1077803
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 08 June 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 08 June 2012 28 November 2012 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2011 20 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 20 January 2012 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2010 23 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 23 September 2010 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2009 29 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 29 September 2009 On Time