REMEMBER (THE CHRONIC FATIGUE SYNDROME SOCIETY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving help and advice to people who suffer from M.E. (otherwise known as Chronic Fatigue Syndrome) and their carers. This includes campaigning for better services, working with the statutory services to improve serevices, running self-management courses, organising presentations by health care professionals and others, issuing a quarterly newsletter, and a telephone helpline.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 October 1999: Standard registration
- 11 May 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 May 2023: Funds transferred to 801279 THE MYALGIC ENCEPHALOPATHY ASSOCIATION LIMITED
- REMEMBER (Working name)
- REMEMBER (THE CHRONIC FATIGUE SOCIETY) (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.93k | £10.62k | £3.05k | £4.11k | £2.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.66k | £6.55k | £7.16k | £5.31k | £2.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £100 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 JULY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 27 SEPTEMBER 2007 as amended on 15 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CHRONIC FATIGUE SYNDROME (CFS), OTHERWISE KNOWN AS MYALGIC ENCEPHALOMYELITIS (ME), AND FOR THAT PURPOSE TO ARRANGE AND, WHERE NECESSARY, FUND THE APPROPRIATE TREATMENT, AND FURTHER TO ASSIST IN THE REHABILITATION OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM CFS/ME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window