Accounts and annual returns APS CULTURAL FUND ( LBS )

Charity number: 1080066
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2014 18 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2013 21 March 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2012 16 February 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 Not Required