Accounts and annual returns LINC THE LEUKAEMIA AND INTENSIVE CHEMOTHERAPY FUND

Charity number: 1078183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window