Financial history LINC THE LEUKAEMIA AND INTENSIVE CHEMOTHERAPY FUND

Charity number: 1078183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £217.85k £219.49k £169.00k £204.78k £207.01k
Total expenditure £200.14k £154.42k £211.42k £219.42k £212.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A