Financial history Boodles Charitable Trust

Charity number: 1077748
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £302.71k £119.64k £1.52m £2.54m £1.30m
Total expenditure £191.31k £281.00k £399.61k £487.75k £713.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £1.50m £2.50m £1.20m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £19.39k £36.30k £97.45k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £399.61k £487.75k £713.03k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0