Financial history MOSS SIDE MILLENNIUM POWERHOUSE LTD

Charity Number: 1077564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £324.90k £397.88k £496.74k £559.45k £906.12k
Total expenditure £310.16k £369.36k £442.47k £477.92k £698.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £102.40k £100.00k £238.96k £250.89k £510.83k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £100.50k £271.65k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £23.97k £18.31k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £432.80k £608.73k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £270.05k
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £2.17k £7.43k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £476.22k £637.91k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £1.70k £60.69k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £1.71k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0