EXMINSTER SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organises and runs fund-raising activities for the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 09 November 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Danielle Ruth Cooke | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Doucas | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Walsh | Trustee | 31 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Girvan | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marie Greenslade | Trustee | 29 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.64k | £10.13k | £7.82k | £12.41k | £13.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.01k | £5.10k | £14.40k | £7.97k | £8.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 September 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 September 2023 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 September 2022 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/10/1994 AS AMENDED ON 04/10/1999 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE EXMINSTER, DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Exminster Community Primary School
Deepway Lane
Exminster
Exeter
Devon
EX6 8AJ
- Phone:
- 01392 824340
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window