KILBURN YOUTH CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
KYC runs a wide range of services for young people in the NW London area, including a CLS accredited advice service, a full sexual health service which includes full STI screening, family planning, and health promotion in schools and youth clubs. We also have a counselling service, an LGB project, self harm group, young parents services, an accredited learning package and a recording studio.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Total income:
£705,789
Donations and legacies | £655.57k | |
Charitable activities | £41.11k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £4.01k | |
Other | £5.10k |
Total expenditure:
£605,876
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £568.02k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £37.86k | |
Charitable expenditure | £568.02k | |
Retained for future use | £99.91k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 March 2000: Standard registration
- 13 April 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 13 April 2010: Funds transferred to 703163 PEOPLE POTENTIAL POSSIBILITIES
- KYC (Working name)
- KILBURN YOUTH RESOURCE CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £345.08k | £499.97k | £389.97k | £441.09k | £705.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £269.33k | £476.10k | £430.74k | £424.51k | £605.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £655.57k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £41.11k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.01k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.10k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £568.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £52.10k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £296.42k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £101.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 27 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 06 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 11 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 14 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 05 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 05 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 25 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 25 January 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 22ND FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 31ST MAY 2001
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN KILBURN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ( THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND TO ASSIST THEM GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY 2) TO RELIEVE YOUNG PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES RESIDING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING FREE INFORMATION, ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND ASSISTANCE AND OTHER SERVICES WHICH SUCH PERSON WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN 3) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND MANAGE SUCH A CENTRE
Area of benefit
KILBURN AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window