PAROLE DE FOI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A non-profit charity that aims to support the French speaking community to integrate within the English society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 February 2000: Standard registration
- PIERRES VIVANTES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR MICHEL KOULAEROU DOUE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
KAGOUEHI PROSPER ZOUCOUBA | Trustee | 03 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIKA RAYMOND AKICHI | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.17k | £154.57k | £101.67k | £93.05k | £89.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.35k | £166.36k | £105.16k | £85.28k | £83.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.05k | £2.47k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22ND JULY 1999, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22ND DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BUT ESPECIALLY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE BUT ESPECIALLY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 12
Broomfield House
Massinger Street
London
SE17 1SY
- Phone:
- 02072772310
- Email:
- paroledefoi@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window