THE HORN AID UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE HORN OF AFRICA AS WELL AS THOSE REFUGEES ORIGINATING FROM THAT REGION WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULARL FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: (A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING (B) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH (C) TO RELIEVE POVERTY (D)TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 07 April 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAID ABDI IMAM | Chair | 23 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Abdi-Nasir Nurie Yusuf | Trustee | 17 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
EBADO AHMED MOHAMED | Trustee | 15 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150 | £0 | £0 | £750 | £2.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150 | £0 | £0 | £750 | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 09/03/2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE HORN OF AFRICA AS WELL AS THOSE REFUGEES ORIGINATING FROM THAT REGION WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: (A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING (B) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH (C) TO RELIEVE POVERTY (D)TO PROVIDE, AND TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF, INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO THOSE WHO NEED IT.
Area of benefit
UK AND HORN OF AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 MITCHAM LANE
STREATHAM
LONDON
SW16 6NN
- Phone:
- 07804658330
- Email:
- hornaiduk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window