SRI BARDAI BRAHMIN SAMAJ (LEICESTER) UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Samaj organises events, functions and education sessions that ensure advancement of Hindu religion and cultural tradition with particular reference to Bardai Brahmins. We ensure that these functions provide recreational or other leisure time occupation in the interest of social welfare for the members of the local community and in particular the Samaj.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 15 May 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kamlesh Vallabhdas Joshi | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harsh Vasantray Modha | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hirenkumar Thanki | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megha Ravikumar Dave | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ankita Jignesh Bhatt | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vishnu Vijay Chhelavada | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vishal Harishchandra Dave | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vanita Pravinchandra Bhogaita | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dhara Samir Popat | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kaushik Vyas | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bharat Jivram Modha | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ravikumar Anilkumar Dave | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harshad Harish Joshi | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chintalben Harshad Joshi | Trustee | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pravinchandra Bhogaita | Trustee | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.38k | £15.97k | £2.04k | £13.29k | £13.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.24k | £6.06k | £1.33k | £14.60k | £10.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 NOVEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED ON 10 DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HINDU RELIGION AND CULTURAL TRADITION WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO BARDAI BRAHMINS B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN HINDU RELIGION CULTURE AND TRADITIONS C) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR THE SAMAJ WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT D) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE IS CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THEIR NEEDS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL BY THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
128 Laverton Road
Hamilton
LEICESTER
LE5 1WJ
- Phone:
- 07743553547
- Email:
- secretary@bardaionline.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window