Governing document THE HOLST BIRTHPLACE TRUST
Charity number: 1078599

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 NOVEMBER 1999 as amended on 05 Jul 2021 as amended on 03 Jul 2017 as amended on 03 Jul 2018 as amended on 01 Jul 2013
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY:- 1) THE MAINTENANCE PROMOTION AND CONTINUING DEVELOPMENT OF A MUSEUM AND PERIOD HOUSE DEDICATED TO GUSTAV HOLST; AND 2) ENCOURAGING THE ART OF MUSIC
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE IN CHELTENHAM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.