Sight Support Worthing

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting and enhancing the independence and wellbeing of visually impaired people. Including events, clubs & classes, assistive tech, counselling and advisory services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 08 December 1999: Standard registration
- SIGHT SUPPORT WORTHING (Working name)
- WORTHING SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsey Jane Tunbridge-Adams | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly O'Haire | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adil Siganporia | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Cherry Christina Ward | Trustee | 17 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
NEIL CLARKE | Trustee | 24 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.91k | £114.09k | £352.43k | £207.38k | £224.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £219.26k | £200.86k | £274.57k | £418.57k | £505.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £676 | £1.27k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 3 AUGUST 1999 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 2 DECEMBER 1999 AND 14 SEPTEMBER 2006 as amended on 08 Oct 2021 as amended on 05 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE BLIND OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED LIVING WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE BOROUGH OF WORTHING
Area of benefit
WORTHING
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 Rowlands Road
Worthing
BN11 3JT
- Phone:
- 01903235782
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window