777 CONSERVATION VOLUNTEERS

Charity Number: 1077259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A volunteer organisation, registered with the charity commission and BTCV carrying out Conservation/Education

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £7
Total expenditure: £166

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 September 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CRISPIN JOHN BEALE BSC ACA Chair
None on record
ANDREW MARK BRADSHAW Trustee
None on record
AMANDA ELIZABETH BEALE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1 £1 £0 £3 £7
Total expenditure £192 £192 £192 £192 £166
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 13 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 21 June 2024 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 02 June 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 14 June 2022 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 14 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
COLD BLOW FARM
HASTINGLEIGH
ASHFORD
TN25 5HF
Phone:
07702192561
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available