MALDON DISTRICT ISLAMIC CULTURAL ASSOCIATION ( MICA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
101-GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES 102-EDUCATION/TRAINING 108-RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 18 August 2000: Standard registration
- MALDON DISTRICT ISLAMIC CULTURAL ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- MALDON ISLAMIC CULTURAL ASSOCIATION ( MICA) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
mohammad Tufael Ahmed | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.09k | £28.30k | £15.77k | £16.23k | £28.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.49k | £22.00k | £14.74k | £20.22k | £28.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 November 2024 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 May 2024 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 January 2022 | 450 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JULY 2000 AS AMENDED 17 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE QURAN AND SUNNAH. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MUSLIM CHILDREN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF ISLAM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Muslim Hall
Church Street
MALDON
CM9 5HP
- Phone:
- 07511787642
- Email:
- MALDONMOSQUE@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window