Accounts and annual returns CANOLFAN GYMUNED DOLANOG

Charity number: 1081244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2024 08 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2023 26 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 11 September 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 31 August 2023 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 23 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required