Financial history HIS PRESENCE TEMPLE MINISTRY

Charity number: 1077396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £32.53k £31.38k £35.60k £32.84k £32.97k
Total expenditure £37.82k £31.73k £29.80k £38.83k £37.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A