SOUND MINDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sound Minds is a user led social enterprise applying the arts to improve the lives of people living with mental ill health through: music, filmmaking, theatre and the visual arts accredited courses in Popular Music and Filmmaking A booking agency for performances and workshops communicating about mental health a peer to peer hospital Ward Visiting service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 24 February 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHEBA FORBES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jewel Leanne Boothe | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Devon Lambert Marston | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Honor Alphonse | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lam | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leopold Benenfield Christopher KING | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARAH RACKHAM | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Oliver Richard Nesbit | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Evans | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.78k | £141.99k | £156.28k | £219.07k | £296.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.27k | £137.09k | £154.53k | £225.24k | £239.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £71.52k | £71.25k | N/A | £4.98k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.80k | £26.67k | £13.42k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14TH APRIL 1999, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27TH NOVEMBER 1999 AND 21 DECEMBER 2005. as amended on 14 Jun 2021 null as amended on 24 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
To promote the preservation of mental health and to assist in relieving and rehabilitating persons suffering from mental disorder or conditions of emotional or mental distress in London (all the London Boroughs) and neighbouring counties through the provision of opportunities for education, training, musical and cultural activities, and other opportunities in relieving and rehabilitating such persons.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUND MINDS
20-22 YORK ROAD
BATTERSEA
LONDON
SW11 3QA
- Phone:
- 02072071786
- Email:
- staff@soundminds.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window