EDEN'S PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Youth Work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,143 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 13 December 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Drew Quayle | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Davy | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Smith | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Matthew Peter Hunt | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.68k | £84.03k | £50.50k | £38.93k | £68.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.49k | £58.90k | £62.40k | £90.54k | £62.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.79k | £47.89k | £7.92k | £7.92k | £11.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 18TH AUGUST 1999.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK AND ELSEWHERE AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (B) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS IN SAID COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY (THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY) IN THE AREA OF MUSIC AND ARTS AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN THE SAID COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (D) TO RELIEVE PERSONS , PARTICULARLY YOUNG PEOPLE , WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (E) TO PROVIDE HELP AND ADVICE TO YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED IN RELATION TO WELFARE BENEFITS , DEBT AND PERSONAL FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT , ACCOMMODATION AND HOMELESSNESS, THE GAINING AND MAINTAINING OF EMPLOYMENT AND SIMILAR MATTERS IN THE SAID COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FITS; (F) TO RELIEVE PERSONS , PARTICULARLY YOUNG PEOPLE, WHO ARE EXPERIENCING MENTAL OR EMOTIONAL SUFFERING AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS ASSOCIATED THEREWITH , INCLUDING BY MEANS OF PROVIDING ADVICE, COUNSEL, ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT TO SUCH PERSONS IN THE SAID COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FORM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (G) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE ADVICE AND EDUCATION INTO THE DANGERS OF DRUG, ALCOHOL OR OTHER SUBSTANCE ADDICTION OR ABUSE IN THE SAID COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FORM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (H) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY, PARTICULARLY YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE COMMUNITY IN THE SAID COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT;
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Edens Project
45 Gainsborough Street
SUDBURY
CO10 2EU
- Phone:
- 01787375247
- Email:
- info@edensproject.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window