ST MARY'S ELTHAM COMMUNITY CENTRES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of community facilities and support to local community groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £17,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Greenwich
Governance
- 03 September 1999: Standard registration
- ST MARY'S COMMUNITY COMPLEX (Working name)
- ST. MARY'S ( ELTHAM ) COMMUNITY COMPLEX ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shivani McCormack | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Lobo | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Crossley | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Milena Mitova | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bee Twidale | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marian McGuigan | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Treacher | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIA GALE | Trustee | 13 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £235.06k | £292.40k | £275.71k | £216.57k | £260.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £251.29k | £214.90k | £240.43k | £252.71k | £251.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.00k | £152.22k | £59.82k | £40.00k | £17.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH AND ESPECIALLY THE AREA SOUTH OF SHOOTERS HILL AND SHOOTERS HILL ROAD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY COMPLEX AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH AND ESPECIALLY THE AREA SOUTH OF SHOOTERS HILL AND SHOOTERS HILL ROAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
180 ELTHAM HIGH STREET
LONDON
SE9 1BJ
- Phone:
- 020883785587
- Email:
- patrick@stmarys-eltham.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window