DAYBREAK FAMILY GROUP CONFERENCES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide FGC facilities to assist children, young people and adults in danger, suffering or being abused. To enhance the responsibility of these groups and their families and extended networks and to enrich family life. To advance the education of the community through training programmes, workshops, conferences, consultation and advice, directed towards FGC and other related practitioners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£720,050
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £693.28k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £26.77k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£846,810
Raising funds | £11.53k | |
Charitable activities | £825.83k | |
Other | £9.46k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £655,638 from 7 government contract(s) and £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £20.98k | |
Charitable expenditure | £825.83k |
People

14 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 September 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian Bennett | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Fuller | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Eves | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adepeju Adetutu Ariyo | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donna Ellen Hill | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Henrietta Lacey-Gutsell | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Eleanor Flora Emuss | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.06m | £1.26m | £1.25m | £833.83k | £720.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £888.45k | £991.16k | £959.09k | £976.04k | £846.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £730.94k | £859.69k | £949.83k | £804.90k | £655.64k | |
|
Income from government grants | £291.69k | £396.37k | £272.90k | N/A | £15.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.06m | £1.26m | £1.25m | £821.14k | £693.28k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £319 | £990 | £3.60k | £12.70k | £26.77k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £888.45k | £973.30k | £959.09k | £976.04k | £825.83k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £9.61k | £0 | £0 | £11.53k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £8.26k | £7.99k | £6.31k | £214 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £8.26k | £0 | £0 | £9.46k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £14.04k | £13.47k | £3.22k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £550.21k | £1.14m | £1.14m | £898.20k | £805.44k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £248.24k | £569.74k | £264.83k | £141.50k | £175.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/06/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS AND IN PARTICULAR: A) TO SET UP AND MAINTAIN A FAMILY GROUP CONFERENCE FACILITY TO ASSIST CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS IN DANGER, SUFFERING OR BEING ABUSED PHYSICALLY, SEXUALLY OR MENTALLY OR WHOSE SOCIAL CONDITIONS ARE SUCH THAT THEY REQUIRE SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES TO MAKE EFFECTIVE DECISIONS FOR THEMSELVES. B) TO BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY WITH A VIEW TO ENHANCING THE RESPONSIBILITY OF SUCH CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS, THEIR FAMILIES AND EXTENDED NETWORKS, ENRICHING FAMILY LIFE AND UNDERTAKING ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THEIR BENEFIT. C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE COMMUNITY BY IMPROVING THE SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE OF FAMILY GROUP CONFERENCE AND OTHER RELATED PRACTITIONERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING PROGRAMMES, WORKSHOPS, CONFERENCES, CONSULTATION AND ADVICE.
Area of benefit
THE SOUTHERN REGION OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Regus
Cumberland House
15-17 Cumberland Place
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 2BG
- Phone:
- 02380696644
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window