CHOICES AND RIGHTS DISABILITY COALITION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Choices and Rights Disability Coalition (CARDC) are an organisation run and controlled exclusively by disabled people in the Hull and East Riding area. One of our key roles is to support disabled people and their families to employ Personal Assistants, so they can live independent lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £204,113 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 27 October 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMY Robinson | Chair | 15 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Robin Maunoury | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAWN LAIDLAW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £254.16k | £266.71k | £235.76k | £237.38k | £233.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.85k | £218.37k | £202.14k | £220.56k | £243.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £253.03k | £210.28k | £206.17k | £204.11k | £204.11k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 APRIL 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28 OCTOBER 2010.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES. (I) BY ENABLING PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES TO CONTROL THEIR OWN LIVES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SERVICES, SUPPORT, AND LAWFUL MEANS; (II) BY ENABLEMING PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN SOCIETY ON EQUAL TERMS WITH ALL OTHER MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE CITY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE OR SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHOICES & RIGHTS DISABILTY
COALITION
JUDE LODGE
TIVERTON HOUSETIVERTON ROAD
BRANSHOLME
HULL
- Phone:
- 01482878778
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window