BUILDING BRIDGES INTERFAITH COMMUNITY PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BUILDING BRIDGES PENDLE IS AN INTERFAITH ORGANISATION AND A REGISTERED CHARITY WHICH WANTS TO BRING A REALISATION THAT DIVERSITY, IS A POSITIVE ASPECT IN THE MAKE-UP OF OUR SOCIETY. PEOPLE MUST VIEW DIFFERENCES IN CULTURE AND FAITH AS RICHNESS AND BE AWARE OF COMMONALITIES IN OUR IDENTITY AS CITIZENS OF A MULTI-CULTURAL AND MULTI-FAITH COUNTRY. OUR ACTIVITIES INCLUDE DELIVERING CURRICULUM BASED ED
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 18 November 1999: Standard registration
- 18 December 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 December 2012: Funds transferred to 1144741 BUILDING BRIDGES PENDLE
- BUILDING BRIDGES PENDLE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.13k | £135.60k | £142.73k | £141.69k | £105.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.49k | £161.83k | £137.12k | £133.49k | £108.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 11 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 11 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 14 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 25 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 27 September 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 27 September 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 29 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 29 September 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED 25 OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF RELIGION OF ALL DENOMINATIONS AND CREEDS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITH REFERENCE TO THE CHRISTIAN AND ISLAMIC FAITH 2. TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF RACIAL DISCRIMINATION AND TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY, AND GOOD RELATIONS, BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window