FAMILY LIVES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a range of services to support families face to face, on the phone and on-line. Including: Parentline, free 24hr confidential helpline; extended support for complex, difficult issues; online advice, livechat/email, ask the expert, peer support and information on all aspects of family live; face to face support, group parenting programmes and workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,361,000
Donations and legacies | £993.00k | |
Charitable activities | £1.34m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £31.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,405,000
Raising funds | £58.00k | |
Charitable activities | £2.35m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,317,000 from 13 government contract(s) and £795,000 from 10 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £58.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.35m |
People

106 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- FAMILYLIVES (Previous name)
- PARENTLINE PLUS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neena Rupani | Chair | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Mott | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Giannotta | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Hall | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jon Newton | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jack Ashman | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Land | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fola Davies | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eluned Harries | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerri Louise Summers | Trustee | 03 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
WARWICK JONES | Trustee | 18 October 2006 |
|
|||||
STUART BAYLISS | Trustee | 08 September 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.62m | £3.01m | £2.63m | £2.34m | £2.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.59m | £2.86m | £2.76m | £2.45m | £2.40m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.49m | £1.50m | £1.46m | £1.36m | £1.32m | |
|
Income from government grants | £63.00k | £301.00k | £260.00k | £665.00k | £795.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.09m | £1.48m | £1.15m | £947.00k | £993.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £10.00k | £4.00k | £3.00k | £3.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.52m | £1.52m | £1.49m | £1.38m | £1.34m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.00k | £0 | £0 | £11.00k | £31.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.56m | £2.83m | £2.73m | £2.40m | £2.35m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £34.00k | £29.00k | £31.00k | £55.00k | £58.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £52.00k | £47.00k | £50.00k | £52.00k | £54.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £10.00k | £5.00k | £3.00k | £1.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.86m | £1.78m | £1.52m | £1.35m | £1.36m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £734.00k | £509.00k | £370.00k | £303.00k | £361.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 2ND AUGUST 1999 AND AMENDED 15 NOVEMBER 2000 AND 8 OCTOBER 2003. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF FAMILY MEMBERS AND FAMILIES. 2. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE PSYCHOLOGICAL, LEGAL, MEDICAL OR OTHER PROBLEMS AND EXPERIENCES FOR FAMILY MEMBERS AND FAMILIES AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 3. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG FAMILY MEMBERS AND FAMILIES, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF AN ADVICE AND INFORMATION SERVICE FOR THOSE UNABLE TO ACCESS SUCH RESOURCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Family Lives
The Annex
York House
Salisbury Square
Hatfield
AL9 5AD
- Phone:
- 02075533080
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window