Accounts and annual returns BISHOP IAN RAMSEY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1077973
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2021 09 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 09 February 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2019 25 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 25 April 2020 On Time