TOUCAN EMPLOYMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Toucan Employment supports people with learning Difficulties/Disabilities and autism into, and at, paid employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £55,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 08 November 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laurie Mathison | Chair | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iris Olutola Akinde-Hummel | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mabel Olohije Nwoko | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JAMES SCROGGS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205.80k | £263.87k | £192.46k | £249.53k | £286.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.26k | £203.83k | £206.88k | £214.34k | £258.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.37k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £43.17k | £36.83k | £37.80k | £35.92k | £55.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 MARCH 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 27 FEBRUARY 2007 AND 19 JUNE 2007 AND 31 MARCH 2008 (ARTICLES ONLY)
Charitable objects
3 (A) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WITH PHYSICAL AND/OR MENTAL DISABILITIES THROUGH THE PROVISIONS OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT TO INCREASE THE OPPORTUNITIES OF SUCH PERSONS TO ACQUIRE AND MAINTAIN GAINFUL SATISFYING EMPLOYMENT. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR EMPLOYERS, REGARDING THE DIFFICULTIES FACED BY PERSONS WITH MENTAL AND/OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES IN ACQUIRING EMPLOYMENT AND THE MEASURES WHICH MAY BE TAKEN ALLEVIATE SUCH DIFFICULTIES.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thames Reach
The Employment Academy
29 Peckham Road
London
SE5 8UA
- Phone:
- 02037519681
- Email:
- info@toucanemployment.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window