LITTLE ACORNS PLAYGROUP PEMBROKESHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a playground open to under age school children in Milford Haven and the surrounding areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £93,278 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 08 November 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Newboult | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Taylor | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Virgo | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Taylor | Trustee | 06 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ebony Hawkings | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.44k | £75.60k | £86.80k | £102.91k | £114.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.18k | £82.18k | £87.39k | £88.05k | £106.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £62.26k | £68.62k | £61.15k | £85.43k | £93.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 April 2025 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 April 2025 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 February 2023 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 February 2023 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 April 2021 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 April 2021 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 AUGUST 1999 AS AMENDED 28 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED ON 04 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY A) ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN B) PROVIDING SAFE, HIGH QUALITY GROUP PLAY IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART C) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN D) FURTHERING THE AIM OF THE WALES PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE PEMBROKESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hubberston Community Centre
Milford Haven
Pembrokeshire
United Kingdom
SA73 3PL
- Phone:
- 07900616784
- Email:
- littleacornspembs@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window